LA HB352 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to approval for land acquisition for integrated coastal protection projects by "acquiring authorities"
Title
Relative to approval for land acquisition for integrated coastal protection projects by "acquiring authorities"
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 352 FINAL PASSAGE (#525) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 352 FINAL PASSAGE (#223) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 352 FINAL PASSAGE (#223) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2015. |
2015-06-05 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 72. |
2015-05-28 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-05-27 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-05-26 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-06 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/06/2015. |
2015-04-30 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2015-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2015-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |