LA HB5 | 2024 | 2nd Extraordinary Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Effective date: 04/29/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Effective date: 04/29/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the crime of illegal use of weapons or dangerous instrumentalities as a crime of violence (Item #8) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Designates the crime of illegal use of weapons or dangerous instrumentalities as a crime of violence (Item #8) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 5 FINAL PASSAGE (#67) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Vote on HB 5 FINAL PASSAGE (#34) (Y: 85 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Vote on HB 5 SUSPEND THE RULES (#23) (Y: 73 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Vote on HB 5 CRIMINAL JUSTICE (#8) (Y: 75 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Vote on HB 5 FINAL PASSAGE (#34) (Y: 85 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Vote on HB 5 SUSPEND THE RULES (#23) (Y: 73 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Vote on HB 5 CRIMINAL JUSTICE (#8) (Y: 75 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | Effective date: 04/29/2024. |
2024-03-06 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 17. |
2024-02-29 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-02-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-02-29 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-02-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-02-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 19. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-02-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/22/2024. |
2024-02-21 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | Rules suspended. |
2024-02-20 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2024-02-19 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-09 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/9/2024. |
2024-02-08 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-08 | House | Prefiled. |