LA HB6 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-14 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-14 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Grants any legislatively created public school system the same treatment and authority granted to parishes for purposes of minimum foundation program funding and local taxing authority (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Grants any legislatively created public school system the same treatment and authority granted to parishes for purposes of minimum foundation program funding and local taxing authority (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 6 AMENDMENT # 3534 BY CHENEVERT MODIFY TIME LIMITS (#681) (Y: 38 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-05-14 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/2024. |
2024-05-07 | House | Notice given. |
2024-05-07 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-05-07 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-04-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/2024. |
2024-04-29 | House | Notice given. |
2024-04-29 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-29 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-04-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2024. |
2024-04-24 | House | Notice given. |
2024-04-23 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-23 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/2024. |
2024-04-18 | House | Notice given. |
2024-04-18 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/2024. |
2024-04-16 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported without amendments (11-0-1). |
2024-04-04 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported favorably (12-0. To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-01-19 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/19/2024. |
2024-01-16 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-01-16 | House | Prefiled. |