LA HB607 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the commissioner of insurance's examination and investigation authority
Title
Provides relative to the commissioner of insurance's examination and investigation authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 607 FINAL PASSAGE (#539) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 607 FINAL PASSAGE (#275) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 607 FINAL PASSAGE (#275) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/18. |
2018-05-14 | House | Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules. |
2018-05-11 | House | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-04-26 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-05 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/05/18. |
2018-03-29 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |