LA HB609 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Becomes HB 1276.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Becomes HB 1276.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to state property in Orleans parish
Title
Provides with respect to state property in Orleans parish
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | House | Becomes HB 1276. |
2014-04-23 | House | Reported by substitute (14-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2014-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2014-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |