LA HB609 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 20, nays 81. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 20, nays 81. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the July 1, 2018, sunset date with respect to the applicability of certain exclusions and exemptions from state sales and use tax making the effectiveness of the exclusions and exemptions permanent (EG +$173,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Removes the July 1, 2018, sunset date with respect to the applicability of certain exclusions and exemptions from state sales and use tax making the effectiveness of the exclusions and exemptions permanent (EG +$173,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. John Morris [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 609 FINAL PASSAGE (#312) (Y: 20 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 609 AMENDMENT # 2815 BY DANAHAY MOTION TO ADOPT (#311) (Y: 73 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 609 AMENDMENT # 2748 BY MORRIS JIM MOTION TO ADOPT (#310) (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 609 AMENDMENT # 2815 BY DANAHAY MOTION TO ADOPT (#311) (Y: 73 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 609 AMENDMENT # 2748 BY MORRIS JIM MOTION TO ADOPT (#310) (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 20, nays 81. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. |
2017-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/17. |
2017-05-09 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |