LA HB670 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to examination and licensing fees
Title
Provides relative to examination and licensing fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-23 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2022. |
2022-05-19 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-19 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-19 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2022. |
2022-05-16 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2022. |
2022-05-11 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-11 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-11 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2022. |
2022-05-10 | House | Notice given. |
2022-04-07 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2022. |
2022-04-04 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |