LA HB710 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the provisions of construction management at risk (CMAR)
Title
Provides relative to the provisions of construction management at risk (CMAR)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - House - House Vote on HB 710 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1134) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 710 FINAL PASSAGE (#775) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House Vote on HB 710 FINAL PASSAGE (#241) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 710 FINAL PASSAGE (#775) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House Vote on HB 710 FINAL PASSAGE (#241) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 573. |
2022-05-31 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/26/2022. |
2022-05-26 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-25 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-05-24 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/25/2022. |
2022-05-23 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-15 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-11 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-11 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-04-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/11/2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Notice given. |
2022-04-07 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2022. |
2022-04-04 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0-1). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |