LA HB738 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to horse racing (EN SEE FISC NOTE OF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to horse racing (EN SEE FISC NOTE OF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 738 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#724) (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 738 FINAL PASSAGE (#597) (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 738 RETURN CAL - SUBJ TO CALL (#596) (Y: 8 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 738 AMENDMENT # 2253 BY PEACOCK HB 738 BY MILLER D. (#595) (Y: 5 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 738 HB 738 BY MILLER D. (#225) (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 738 FINAL PASSAGE (#597) (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 738 RETURN CAL - SUBJ TO CALL (#596) (Y: 8 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 738 AMENDMENT # 2253 BY PEACOCK HB 738 BY MILLER D. (#595) (Y: 5 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 738 HB 738 BY MILLER D. (#225) (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-13 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2020-06-13 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 342. |
2020-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-31 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2020-05-29 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20. |
2020-05-29 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 9 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-25 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2020-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-05-20 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 13. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/20. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2020-05-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2020-03-31 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |