LA HB766 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to educational benefits for beneficiaries of qualified veterans (EN +$100,000 GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to educational benefits for beneficiaries of qualified veterans (EN +$100,000 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 766 FINAL PASSAGE (#1367) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Vote on HB 766 FINAL PASSAGE (#828) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Vote on HB 766 FINAL PASSAGE (#828) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-11 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2024. |
2024-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 637. |
2024-06-04 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-30 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-05-01 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2024. |
2024-04-30 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-29 | House | Reported favorably (17-0). |
2024-04-22 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2024-03-26 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-03-25 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |