LA HB830 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adds Tianeptine to Schedule I of the Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substance Law
Title
Adds Tianeptine to Schedule I of the Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substance Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 830 FINAL PASSAGE (#1248) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 830 FINAL PASSAGE (#506) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 830 FINAL PASSAGE (#506) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-19 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2024. |
2024-06-19 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 732. |
2024-05-31 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-28 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/2024. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |