LA HB891 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the procurement of internet services and wide area networks services and systems by state agencies (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the procurement of internet services and wide area networks services and systems by state agencies (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 891 FINAL PASSAGE (#728) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2022. |
2022-05-03 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-02 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-04-04 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |