LA HB974 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Effective date: July 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Effective date: July 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to teacher tenure, pay-for-performance, and evaluations (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to teacher tenure, pay-for-performance, and evaluations (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 974, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#240) (Y: 60 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 974, FINAL PASSAGE (#248) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 974, AMENDMENT # 1996 BY GALLOT, HB 974 BY CARTER (#247) (Y: 12 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-23 - House - House Vote on HB 974, FINAL PASSAGE (#45) (Y: 64 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - House - House Vote on HB 974, AMENDMENT # 56 BY DIXON, MOTION TO ADOPT (#44) (Y: 38 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-03-23 - House - House Vote on HB 974, AMENDMENT # 55 BY POPE, MOTION TO ADOPT (#43) (Y: 49 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-23 - House - House Vote on HB 974, AMENDMENT # 47 BY DIXON, MOTION TO ADOPT (#42) (Y: 43 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-03-23 - House - House Vote on HB 974, AMENDMENT # 44 BY SMITH, MOTION TO ADOPT (#41) (Y: 39 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote on HB 974, AMENDMENT # 43 BY SMITH, MOTION TO ADOPT (#39) (Y: 41 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote on HB 974, AMENDMENT # 42 BY DIXON, MOTION TO ADOPT (#38) (Y: 49 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote on HB 974, AMENDMENT # 49 BY CARTER, MOTION TO ADOPT (#37) (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote on HB 974, AMENDMENT # 46 BY CARTER, MOTION TO ADOPT (#36) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote on HB 974, AMENDMENT # 45A BY CARTER, MOTION TO ADOPT (#35) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote on HB 974, RETURN TO THE CALENDAR (#34) (Y: 32 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 974, FINAL PASSAGE (#248) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 974, AMENDMENT # 1996 BY GALLOT, HB 974 BY CARTER (#247) (Y: 12 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-23 - House - House Vote on HB 974, FINAL PASSAGE (#45) (Y: 64 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - House - House Vote on HB 974, AMENDMENT # 56 BY DIXON, MOTION TO ADOPT (#44) (Y: 38 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-03-23 - House - House Vote on HB 974, AMENDMENT # 55 BY POPE, MOTION TO ADOPT (#43) (Y: 49 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-23 - House - House Vote on HB 974, AMENDMENT # 47 BY DIXON, MOTION TO ADOPT (#42) (Y: 43 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-03-23 - House - House Vote on HB 974, AMENDMENT # 44 BY SMITH, MOTION TO ADOPT (#41) (Y: 39 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote on HB 974, AMENDMENT # 43 BY SMITH, MOTION TO ADOPT (#39) (Y: 41 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote on HB 974, AMENDMENT # 42 BY DIXON, MOTION TO ADOPT (#38) (Y: 49 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote on HB 974, AMENDMENT # 49 BY CARTER, MOTION TO ADOPT (#37) (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote on HB 974, AMENDMENT # 46 BY CARTER, MOTION TO ADOPT (#36) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote on HB 974, AMENDMENT # 45A BY CARTER, MOTION TO ADOPT (#35) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote on HB 974, RETURN TO THE CALENDAR (#34) (Y: 32 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Effective date: July 1, 2012. | |
2012-04-18 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1. | |
2012-04-10 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-04-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-04-09 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-04-05 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 60, nays 43, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2012-04-04 | Scheduled for concurrence on 4/5/2012. | |
2012-04-04 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2012-04-04 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 23 yeas and 16 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-03 | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 04/04. | |
2012-04-03 | Rules suspended | |
2012-04-03 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-02 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-03-27 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-03-26 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-03-23 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 62, nays 43. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-03-22 | House floor amendments adopted. | |
2012-03-22 | Called from the calendar. | |
2012-03-22 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-03-19 | Scheduled for floor debate on 3/22/2012. | |
2012-03-19 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-03-15 | Reported with amendments (13-5) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-03-02 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-03-02 | Prefiled. |