LA HCR19 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Department of Transportation and Development to study the practicality and feasibility of designing and utilizing a traffic roundabout at a four-way stop intersection in Livingston Parish
Title
Urges and requests the Department of Transportation and Development to study the practicality and feasibility of designing and utilizing a traffic roundabout at a four-way stop intersection in Livingston Parish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 19 CONCUR (#584) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Vote on HCR 19 HCR 19 BY HODGES (#480) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Vote on HCR 19 HCR 19 BY HODGES (#480) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-17 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-16 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-05-15 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2022-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-26 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-26 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-04-26 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2022. |
2022-04-19 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2022-03-16 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-03-15 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |