LA HCR76 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes Monday, April 27, 2015, as Concrete Day at the state capitol
Title
Recognizes Monday, April 27, 2015, as Concrete Day at the state capitol
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-05-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-04-28 | House | Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-04-27 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |