LA HCR76 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Tuesday, May 16, 2017, as Louisiana Judicial Council of the National Bar Association Day at the state capitol
Title
Designates Tuesday, May 16, 2017, as Louisiana Judicial Council of the National Bar Association Day at the state capitol
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 76 ADOPT (#323) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-05-17 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-05-16 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2017-05-16 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |