LA HCR83 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-18 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-18 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the House and Senate governmental affairs committees to study methods to limit and recover mishandled, misused, and misappropriated public funds
Title
Requests the House and Senate governmental affairs committees to study methods to limit and recover mishandled, misused, and misappropriated public funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 83, ADOPT (#1273) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-18 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2010-06-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-15 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-14 | Read by title, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2010-06-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2010. | |
2010-06-10 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-10 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2010-06-09 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-05-03 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-05-03 | Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-29 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 3, 2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2010-04-21 | Reported favorably (11-0). | |
2010-04-07 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-04-06 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |