LA HR111 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes the United States Congress to reform the Foreign Intelligence and Surveillance Act, the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court, and to restore the rights of privacy and unreasonable search and seizure
Title
Memorializes the United States Congress to reform the Foreign Intelligence and Surveillance Act, the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court, and to restore the rights of privacy and unreasonable search and seizure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-13 - House - House Vote on HR 111 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#984) (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2024-05-15 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-13 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2024-05-13 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-05-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2024. |
2024-05-09 | House | Notice given. |
2024-05-09 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-05-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2024. |
2024-04-30 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-29 | House | Reported favorably (10-0-1). |
2024-04-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |