LA HR258 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Department of Transportation and Development to study the expansion of a portion of Lousiana Highway 21 to four lanes
Title
Urges and requests the Department of Transportation and Development to study the expansion of a portion of Lousiana Highway 21 to four lanes
Sponsors
Rep. John Wyble [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - House - House Vote on HR 258 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1611) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2024-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-30 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2024-05-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2024. |
2024-05-29 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-29 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-05-20 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |