LA SB173 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-22 - Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-22 - Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for release of certain group information to the group policyholder or his agent prior to renewal of a group policy. (8/15/11) (RE1 NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides for release of certain group information to the group policyholder or his agent prior to renewal of a group policy. (8/15/11) (RE1 NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 173, REJECT (#859) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - House Vote on SB 173, FINAL PASSAGE (#657) (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - House Vote on SB 173, AMENDMENT # 300 BY KATZ, Amendments no. 4 (#656) (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 173, FINAL PASSAGE (#150) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - House Vote on SB 173, FINAL PASSAGE (#657) (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - House Vote on SB 173, AMENDMENT # 300 BY KATZ, Amendments no. 4 (#656) (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 173, FINAL PASSAGE (#150) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-22 | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2011-06-21 | House conferees appointed: Huval, Kleckley, and Katz. | |
2011-06-21 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2011-06-21 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Adley, Broome, and Morrish. | |
2011-06-21 | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. | |
2011-06-21 | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending. | |
2011-06-15 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2011-06-15 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-13 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/15/2011. | |
2011-06-13 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-09 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2011-06-08 | Reported with amendments (5-3-1) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-05-18 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2011-05-17 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2011-05-16 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-12 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-11 | Reported with amendments. | |
2011-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Insurance. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Insurance. |