LA SB20 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to voting and the holding of elections impaired as the result of a declared emergency or disaster. (1/1/21) (Item #5) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to voting and the holding of elections impaired as the result of a declared emergency or disaster. (1/1/21) (Item #5) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 20 CONCUR (#224) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - House - House Vote on SB 20 FINAL PASSAGE (#244) (Y: 59 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 20 FINAL PASSAGE (#17) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - House - House Vote on SB 20 FINAL PASSAGE (#244) (Y: 59 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 20 FINAL PASSAGE (#17) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2020-10-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-10-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-10-23 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-10-23 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2020-10-22 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 59, nays 27. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-10-22 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2020-10-21 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-10-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/21/20. |
2020-10-20 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-10-20 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-20 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-10-20 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-10-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 12 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-09-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |