LA SB252 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Effective date 8/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Effective date 8/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires city, parish and other local public school boards to adopt and implement a program to facilitate behavior health intervention and referral for treatment. (8/1/24) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)
Title
Requires city, parish and other local public school boards to adopt and implement a program to facilitate behavior health intervention and referral for treatment. (8/1/24) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)
Sponsors
Sen. Beth Mizell [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 252 FINAL PASSAGE (#1334) (Y: 79 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 252 FINAL PASSAGE (#235) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 252 FINAL PASSAGE (#235) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2024. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 324. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/23/2024. |
2024-05-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2024-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 14. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-05-22 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2024. |
2024-05-21 | House | Notice given. |
2024-05-21 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/2024. |
2024-05-09 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-08 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-05-07 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-04-09 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |