LA SB272 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date 6/16/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date 6/16/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to wagering on horse races in a sports book lounge. (8/1/22)
Title
Provides relative to wagering on horse races in a sports book lounge. (8/1/22)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on SB 272 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1677) (Y: 83 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 272 ADOPT (#1398) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 272 REJECT (#1171) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 272 FINAL PASSAGE (#1330) (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 272 FINAL PASSAGE (#421) (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 272 ADOPT (#1398) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 272 REJECT (#1171) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 272 FINAL PASSAGE (#1330) (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 272 FINAL PASSAGE (#421) (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Senate | Effective date 6/16/2022. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 530. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2022. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2022-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 83, nays 4. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2022-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. |
2022-06-05 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Conference Committee report received on June 3 replaced with a new version received on June 5. |
2022-06-05 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2022-06-03 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-06-03 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Smith, Connick, and Cortez. |
2022-06-02 | House | House conferees appointed: Stefanski, Davis, and Hughes. |
2022-06-02 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2022-06-01 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 7. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2022. |
2022-05-18 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-17 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-16 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2022-05-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 4 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |