LA SB295 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Effective date 8/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Effective date 8/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to non-gaming economic development by the casino operator. (8/1/16)
Title
Provides relative to non-gaming economic development by the casino operator. (8/1/16)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - House - House Vote on SB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#1024) (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#150) (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#132) (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#150) (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#132) (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2016. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 483. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2016-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2016-05-25 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 23. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2016. |
2016-05-13 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-12 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-04-07 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2016-04-06 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | The bill, as previously amended, was read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 9 nays, ordered reengrossed, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Reconsidered. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 16 yeas and 17 nays. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |