LA SB297 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the state Dept. of Education and the Dept. of Health to survey students regarding certain risk behavior associated with chronic health conditions. (8/1/18)
Title
Authorizes the state Dept. of Education and the Dept. of Health to survey students regarding certain risk behavior associated with chronic health conditions. (8/1/18)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Claitor [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 297 FINAL PASSAGE (#457) (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Senate | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 13 yeas and 21 nays. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |