LA SB465 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Effective date 8/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Effective date 8/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for vacancies in the board of commissioners of the Southeast Louisiana Flood Protection Authority-East and Southeast Louisiana Flood Protection Authority-West. (8/1/22)
Title
Provides for vacancies in the board of commissioners of the Southeast Louisiana Flood Protection Authority-East and Southeast Louisiana Flood Protection Authority-West. (8/1/22)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 465 FINAL PASSAGE (#1338) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 465 FINAL PASSAGE (#469) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 465 FINAL PASSAGE (#469) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2022. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 431. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-06-01 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2022. |
2022-05-18 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-17 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-16 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-05 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-05-04 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |