LA SB78 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-29 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 27. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-29 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 27. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to authorize the legislature, by law, to establish additional courts enacted by a two-thirds vote. (2/3 - CA12s1(A)) (EG1 SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Title
Constitutional amendment to authorize the legislature, by law, to establish additional courts enacted by a two-thirds vote. (2/3 - CA12s1(A)) (EG1 SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Sponsors
Sen. John Morris [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 78 FINAL PASSAGE (#1603) (Y: 60 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 78 FINAL PASSAGE (#1343) (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 78 FINAL PASSAGE (#296) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 78 FINAL PASSAGE (#1343) (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 78 FINAL PASSAGE (#296) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 27. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-29 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2024. |
2024-05-28 | House | Notice given. |
2024-05-28 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2024-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 22. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending. |
2024-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2024. |
2024-05-22 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-21 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-05-20 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-06 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2024-05-01 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-04-16 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 11 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |