LA SB92 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 244.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 244.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for uniform definitions of independent contractor and employee, and for penalties for the misclassification of employees. (2/3 - CA7s2.1(A)) (1/1/22) (OR INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides for uniform definitions of independent contractor and employee, and for penalties for the misclassification of employees. (2/3 - CA7s2.1(A)) (1/1/22) (OR INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 244. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Reported by substitute. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |