LA SCR28 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Louisiana Foster and Adoptive Parent Association and designates May 17, 2010, as the Louisiana Foster and Adoptive Parent Association Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
Title
Commends the Louisiana Foster and Adoptive Parent Association and designates May 17, 2010, as the Louisiana Foster and Adoptive Parent Association Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 28, ADOPT (#49) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-04-12 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-04-08 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-04-07 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2010-04-06 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2010-04-06 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |