LA SCR28 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-15)
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-15)
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences upon the death of Benjamin W. Mount of Lake Charles, Louisiana.
Title
Expresses condolences upon the death of Benjamin W. Mount of Lake Charles, Louisiana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 28, ADOPT (#76) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-03-29 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-03-29 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-03-28 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-03-28 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2012-03-27 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2012-03-26 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |
2012-03-21 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |