MA H1012 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5041
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enhance food traceability and promote local farms. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To improve public access to healthy food through enhanced food traceability within the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Peter Capano [D] | Rep. James Kelcourse [R] |
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. Steven Ultrino [D] | Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] | Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5041 |
2021-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S1418 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H559 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5136
S2483 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1389 (Similar To) 2022-01-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2614
S299 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1025 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S1408 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2770
S2116 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S503 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S499 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S954 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S567 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H559 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5136
S2483 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1389 (Similar To) 2022-01-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2614
S299 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1025 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S1408 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2770
S2116 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S503 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S499 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S954 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S567 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1012 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1012.pdf |