MA H1013 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3962
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3962
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3962
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to employee protection. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to defense against abusive waivers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3962 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S314 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S1156 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
S1345 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1330 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S970 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S989 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2186
S1379 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3962 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
S2610 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1156 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
S1345 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1330 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S970 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S989 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2186
S1379 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3962 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
S2610 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1013 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1013.pdf |