MA H1030 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5041
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to certain hunting zones. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to certain hunting zones
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D] | Rep. David Robertson [D] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] |
Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Norman Orrall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5041 |
2021-12-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 01:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S320 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
H3537 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S2050 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S2038 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2817 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5244
S1842 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S2116 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3537 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S2050 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S2038 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2817 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5244
S1842 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S2116 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1030 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1030.pdf |