MA H1039 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to encourage transportation network company pre-arranged shared rides. Financial Services.
Title
To reduce congestion and encourage shared rides
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S2063 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S102 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2895
S1755 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1171 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1041 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence
H1067 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S102 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2895
S1755 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1171 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1041 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence
H1067 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 29, 2020, pending concurrence
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1039 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1039.pdf |