MA H1057 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish uniform confidentiality and enforcement provisions relative to certain licensees under the jurisdiction of the Division of Banks. Financial Services.
Title
Establishing uniform confidentiality and enforcement provisions relative to certain licensees under the jurisdiction of the Division of Banks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-05-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1026 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1679 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S1260 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S1910 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1679 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S1260 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S1910 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1057 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1057.pdf |