MA H1065 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to motor vehicle service contracts. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to motor vehicle service contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-27 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2022-12-27 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-03-24 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-03-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-08-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S657 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2698
H1183 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5003
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2353 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5224 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1183 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5003
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2353 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5224 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1065 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1065.pdf |