MA H1112 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4465
Note: Legislation replaced by H4467
Note: Legislation replaced by H4467
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4467
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4467
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mrs. O'Connell of Taunton, a petition of Shaunna O'Connell and others that candidates for public office be authorized to appoint poll watchers to observe the sealing of ballots. Election Laws.
Title
Permitting candidates to appoint poll watchers
Sponsors
Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R] | Rep. Patricia Haddad [D] | Rep. Sheila Harrington [R] | Sen. Robert Hedlund [R] |
Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Steven Levy [R] | Rep. George Ross [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4467 |
2011-04-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/11/2011 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H4465 (Replaced by) 2012-10-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4467 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
H4467 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1112 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12835&generalCourtId=1 |