MA H1127 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to making technical changes to the Betsy Lehman Center for patient safety and medical error reduction enabling law. Health Care Financing.
Title
Making technical changes to the Betsy Lehman Center for patient safety and medical error reduction enabling statute
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Balser [D] | Sen. Cynthia Creem [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S669 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1127 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1127.pdf |