MA H1128 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4451
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4451
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4451
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the annual stipend for members of the Commonwealth’s hazardous material response teams. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Act to increase the annual stipend for members of the Commonwealth’s hazardous material response teams
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-27 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4451 |
2011-05-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4451 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1128 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13071&generalCourtId=1 |