MA H1138 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4463
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4463
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4463
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the water pollution abatement revolving loan program. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the water pollution abatement revolving loan program
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Koczera [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] |
Sen. Karen Spilka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4463 |
2012-01-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2011 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4463 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1138 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12479&generalCourtId=1 |