MA H1141 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1158
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to protecting farm viability. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To protect farm viability
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Kulik [D] | Rep. John Scibak [D] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Sen. Stanley Rosenberg [D] |
Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-02-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-02-13 | House | Accompanied by H1158 |
2011-07-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2011 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H1158 (Replaces) 2012-02-13 - Accompanied H1141
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1141 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11605&generalCourtId=1 |