MA H115 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4486
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing low interest loans to families with children suffering from terminal illnesses. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To provide a pilot program for low interest loans to families with a child suffering from a terminal illness
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4486 |
2019-05-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H4486 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H115 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H115.pdf |