MA H1171 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5208
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to dental insurance assignment of benefits. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to dental insurance assignment of benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5208 |
2021-07-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1181 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S714 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2701
S1720 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
H1221 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5167
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
S927 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S967 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H5208 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2639 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2637 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2553 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S714 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2701
S1720 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
H1221 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5167
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
S927 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S967 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H5208 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2639 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2637 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2553 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1171 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1171.pdf |