MA H1182 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4233
Note: Legislation replaced by H4244
Note: Legislation replaced by H4244
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the penalty for killing, maiming or poisoning of animals. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the penalty for killing, maiming or poisoning of animals
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-07 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4244 |
2014-06-30 | House | Recommitted to the committee on The Judiciary |
2014-06-30 | House | Reported on a part of H4233 |
2014-06-30 | House | Reported from the committee on House Rules |
2014-06-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4233 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4233 (Replaced by) 2014-06-30 - Reported, in part, by H1182
H4244 (Replaced by) 2014-07-22 - New draft substituted, see H4328
H4244 (Replaced by) 2014-07-22 - New draft substituted, see H4328
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1182 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1182.pdf |