MA H1217 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4109
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the sale of electronic devices used to deliver liquid nicotine vapor to minors. Public Health.
Title
Modernizing tobacco control and protecting the health of minors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-11 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4109 |
2017-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S930 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1180 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
H2864 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
H2274 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4701
H834 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3091 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H115 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H754 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H803 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H881 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4109 (Replaced by) 2018-05-09 - New draft substituted, see H4479
H1180 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
H2864 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
H2274 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4701
H834 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3091 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H115 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H754 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H803 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H881 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4109 (Replaced by) 2018-05-09 - New draft substituted, see H4479
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1217 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1217.pdf |