MA H1230 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5003
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5003
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5003
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to insurance premium criteria. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to insurance premium criteria
Sponsors
Rep. Claire Cronin [D] | Rep. Kip Diggs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5003 |
2021-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H2930 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H1130 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5003
S705 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2699
H5003 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1273 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied S741
H2448 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4927
H4927 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1130 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5003
S705 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2699
H5003 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1273 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied S741
H2448 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4927
H4927 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1230 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1230.pdf |