MA H1265 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4960
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the transparency and affordability of the Group Insurance Commission. Health Care Financing.
Title
To create a special commission to improve transparency and affordability at the Group Insurance Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4960 |
2021-11-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-05-24 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H2638 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2583 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S640 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S634 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S726 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2856
S733 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S666 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
H4960 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2583 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S640 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S634 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S726 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2856
S733 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S666 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
H4960 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1265 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1265.pdf |