MA H1289 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4311
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4311
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4311
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to certain civil infractions. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to civil infractions for juveniles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4311 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4311 (Replaced by) 2016-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2501 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1286 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H364 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H2991 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H363 (Similar To) 2016-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4582
H2501 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1286 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H364 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H2991 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H363 (Similar To) 2016-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4582
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1289 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1289.pdf |