MA H1292 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4706
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create the position of deputy assistant registers in the Hampden County probate court. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to deputy assistant registers of the Hampden County probate court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4706 |
2015-05-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/27/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4706 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1293 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1294 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1943 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H2874 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H48 (Similar To) 2015-03-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2015
H1293 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1294 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1943 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H2874 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H48 (Similar To) 2015-03-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2015
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1292 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1292.pdf |