MA H1300 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S789
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied S789
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied S789
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Moran of Lawrence, a petition of Frank A. Moran and others that MassHealth make payments for certain graduate medical education training. Health Care Financing.
Title
To promote graduate medical education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Accompanied S789 |
2021-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S739 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S401 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
H722 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H1306 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied S818
S741 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1273 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied S741
S737 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S775 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S776 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S818 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S789 (Replaced by) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S401 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
H722 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H1306 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied S818
S741 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1273 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied S741
S737 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S775 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S776 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S818 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S789 (Replaced by) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1300 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1300.pdf |